This is my multiplication pyramid. For this task we have to times two numbers of the pyramid and keep moving up until you get to the top.

working out for the third row numbers

________

75 x 405=

70 x 400 = 28000

70 x 5 =350

_

5 x 400 =2000

5 x 5 = 25

_

28000 + 350 + 2000 + 25 = 30375

____________________________

__________

405 x 486 =

400 x 400 =160000

400 x 80 =32000

400 x 6 = 2400

_

5 x 80 = 400

5 x 6 = 30

_

160000 + 32000 + 2400 + 400 + 30 = 194830

then I had permission from my maths teacher to calculate the top answers

hi i like the way you work your math by times tlabes.

ReplyDeletehow can you work out the awrmes?